Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthélémy Nguyễn Sơn Lâm, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Thanh Hoá, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1929Born
29 Jun 195727.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
30 Jan 197545.4AppointedBishop of Ðà Lạt, Viet Nam
17 Mar 197545.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ðà Lạt, Viet Nam
23 Mar 199464.6AppointedBishop of Thanh Hoá, Viet Nam
9 Jun 200373.8DiedBishop of Thanh Hoá, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Barthélémy Nguyễn Sơn Lâm
Bishop Barthélémy Nguyễn Sơn Lâm P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Thanh Hoá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTùng Chanh
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saigon, Archdiocese of Saigon

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,608

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 4 Apr 2020

Quantcast