Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Hoăng c Oanh

Bishop Emeritus of Kontum, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1938 Born
22 Dec 196830.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kontum, Viet Nam
16 Jul 200364.7AppointedBishop of Kontum, Viet Nam
28 Aug 200364.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kontum, Viet Nam
7 Oct 201576.9RetiredBishop of Kontum, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Michel Hoăng c Oanh
Bishop Michel Hoăng c Oanh (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kontum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceH Tay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kontum.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,444
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018