Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Léon Seitz, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kontum, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1906Born
13 Mar 193730.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
4 Jul 193730.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
19 Jun 195245.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kontum, Viet Nam
19 Jun 195245.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Catula
3 Oct 195245.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catula
24 Nov 196053.9AppointedBishop of Kontum, Viet Nam
2 Oct 197568.7ResignedBishop of Kontum, Viet Nam
23 Feb 198477.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Kontum, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul-Léon Seitz (VIAF: 3867583)
Bishop Paul-Léon Seitz M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kontum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Havre, Archdiocese of Rouen, France
Ordained Deaconla Médaille Miraculeuse, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestMissions Étrangères de Paris, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopHà Nôi, Vicariate Apostolic of Hà Nôi
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Buried Place (Original)Montparnasse, Cemetery, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 86
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast