Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph V Đc Minh

Bishop of Nha Trang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1944 BornMy Duc
24 Apr 197126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lat, Viet Nam
8 Nov 200561.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam
15 Dec 200561.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam
4 Dec 200965.2SucceededBishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph V Đc Minh:
Bishop Joseph V Đc Minh (born ) Bishop of Nha Trang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nha Trang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,019
  • s: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013