Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Nguyn Tich Duc

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ban M Thut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1938BornBut Dong
21 Dec 196729.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 199759.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ban M Thut, Viet Nam
17 Jun 199759.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ban M Thut, Viet Nam
29 Dec 200062.9SucceededBishop of Ban M Thut, Viet Nam
17 May 200668.2ResignedBishop of Ban M Thut, Viet Nam
23 May 201173.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Ban M Thut, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nguyn Tich Duc:
Bishop Joseph Nguyn Tich Duc (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ban M Thut

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 May 2006
  • d: CB, 24 May 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,016
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013