Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Huynh Dông Các

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Qui Nhơn, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1923Born
17 May 195532.0Ordained PriestPriest of Qui Nhơn, Viet Nam
1 Jul 197451.1AppointedBishop of Qui Nhơn, Viet Nam
11 Aug 197451.2Ordained BishopBishop of Qui Nhơn, Viet Nam
3 Jun 199976.0RetiredBishop of Qui Nhơn, Viet Nam
3 Jun 200077.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Qui Nhơn, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul Huynh Dông Các
Bishop Paul Huynh Dông Các (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Qui Nhơn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGo Thi

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018