Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Vu Huy Chuong

Bishop of Đà Lạt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1944 BornBen Thon
18 Dec 197127.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam
5 Aug 200358.8AppointedBishop of Hưng Hóa, Viet Nam
1 Oct 200359.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hưng Hóa, Viet Nam
1 Mar 201166.4AppointedBishop of Đà Lạt, Viet Nam
17 Mar 201166.5InstalledBishop of Đà Lạt, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Antoine Vu Huy Chuong
Bishop Antoine Vu Huy Chuong (born ) Bishop of Đà Lạt

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Đà Lạt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,469

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Aug 2016