Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Đỗ Mạnh Hùng

Bishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1957 Born
30 Aug 199032.9Ordained PriestPriest of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
25 Jun 201658.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
25 Jun 201658.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Liberalia
4 Aug 201658.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Liberalia
8 Mar 201860.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
3 Dec 201962.2AppointedBishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam
11 Dec 201962.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
12 Dec 201962.2InstalledBishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Đỗ Mạnh Hùng
Bishop Joseph Đỗ Mạnh Hùng (born ) Bishop of Phan Thiết

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaigon
Ordained Bishopséminaire Saint Joseph en plein air, Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh, Archdiocese of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Phan Thiết.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 29 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 3 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,069
  • ab: CB, 10 Mar 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2019
  • i: CB, 4 Dec 2019
  • aadm: CB, 3 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast