Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Nguyễn Ngọc Quang

Deceased

Bishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1909Born
21 Sep 193526.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 196555.6AppointedBishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam
5 May 196555.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam
20 Jun 199080.9DiedBishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jacques Nguyễn Ngọc Quang
Bishop Jacques Nguyễn Ngọc Quang (born , died ) Bishop of Cần Thơ

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhuoc Ngoc Quang

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast