Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Pham Van Nâm

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Acufida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1919Born
18 Sep 194829.0Ordained PriestPriest of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
3 Dec 197758.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
3 Dec 197758.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Acufida
2 Feb 197858.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acufida
30 Sep 199980.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
30 Jun 200181.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Louis Pham Van Nâm
Bishop Louis Pham Van Nâm (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThành-Phô Hô Chí Minh

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast