Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Hà Kim Danh

Deceased

Bishop of Phú Cường, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1913Born
12 Mar 194026.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 198268.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Phú Cường, Viet Nam
10 Oct 198269.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Phú Cường, Viet Nam
10 May 199379.8SucceededBishop of Phú Cường, Viet Nam
22 Feb 199581.6DiedBishop of Phú Cường, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Louis Hà Kim Danh
Bishop Louis Hà Kim Danh (born , died ) Bishop of Phú Cường

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCân Tho

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast