Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Phan Đ́nh Phùng

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Phát Diêm

Titular Bishop of Marciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1891BornKien Thaiau
5 Apr 192432.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 194048.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Phát Diêm, Viet Nam
28 May 194048.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Marciana
3 Dec 194048.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marciana
27 May 194452.4DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Phát Diêm, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean Phan Đ́nh Phùng:
Bishop Jean Phan Đ́nh Phùng (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Phát Diêm

  • a priest for 20.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 79
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013