Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wenceslao Oñate, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Hypsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1841Born
21 Jun 186220.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
Mar 1866³24.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Jul 188240.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
18 Jul 188240.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hypsus
21 Oct 188342.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hypsus
26 Nov 188443.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
23 Jun 189755.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wenceslao Oñate
Bishop Wenceslao Oñate O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEstella, Spain

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017