Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Marie Pineau, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Calama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1842BornLa Tourlandry, France
1863¹20.4ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
26 May 186623.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 May 188643.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam
21 May 188643.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
24 Oct 188644.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
2 Jun 191067.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam
14 Jan 192178.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie Pineau:
Bishop Louis-Marie Pineau M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013