Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Colomer, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Tonking {Tonkino Settentrionale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Themiscyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1833Born
11 Nov 184916.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
17 Jul 185724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Feb 187037.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
11 Feb 187037.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
9 Jul 187138.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
1 Jun 188350.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Tonking {Tonkino Settentrionale}, Viet Nam
7 Feb 190269.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Tonking {Tonkino Settentrionale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Antonio Colomer
Bishop Antonio Colomer O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Tonking {Tonkino Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVich, Spain

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 547
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 40, Number 5
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017