Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Pio Rossi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1829Born
18 Apr 185222.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 May 188151.5AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
26 May 188151.6Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
29 Oct 189263.0DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pio Rossi (VIAF: 89457759)
Bishop Domenico Pio Rossi O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 221
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017