Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Marie-Félix de Gorostarzu, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yünnanfu, China

Titular Bishop of Aela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1860Born
19 May 188322.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 188423.9ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
10 Dec 190747.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yünnan, China
10 Dec 190747.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aela
29 Mar 190847.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aela
1932²71.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Yünnanfu, China
27 Mar 193372.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yünnanfu, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Marie-Félix de Gorostarzu
Bishop Charles-Marie-Félix de Gorostarzu M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yünnanfu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Vincent-de-Tyrosse, Diocese of Aire et Dax, France
Ordained BishopHanoi
Death PlacePenang

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 41
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1908, Number 21
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 1 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,020
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,908

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast