Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marie-Laurent Trioche

Deceased

Archbishop of Baghdad, Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1801Born
1837¹35.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq
14 Mar 183736.0AppointedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
15 Aug 183736.4Ordained BishopBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
19 Sep 184847.5AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
1850²48.8ResignedApostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq
28 Nov 188786.7DiedArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marie-Laurent Trioche
Archbishop Marie-Laurent Trioche (born , died ) Archbishop of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille, France

  • a bishop for 50.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017