Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josep Maria Abella Batlle, C.M.F.

Bishop of Fukuoka, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1949 Born
22 Aug 196616.8First VowsMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
8 Dec 197223.0Perpetual VowsMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
12 Jul 197525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
2 Jun 201868.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osaka, Japan
2 Jun 201868.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Methamaucum
16 Jul 201868.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methamaucum
14 Apr 202070.4AppointedBishop of Fukuoka, Japan
17 May 202070.5InstalledBishop of Fukuoka, Japan

MicroData Summary for Josep Maria Abella Batlle
Bishop Josep Maria Abella Batlle C.M.F. (born ) Bishop of Fukuoka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLleida, Diocese of Lérida, Spain
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Osaka, Archdiocese of Osaka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fukuoka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 15 Jun 2018
  • c34: CB, 15 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,819
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2020
  • i: AM, 30 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 31 May 2020

Quantcast