Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thomas Aquino Manyo Cardinal Maeda

Archbishop of Osaka, Japan

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1949 Born
19 Mar 197526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nagasaki, Japan
13 Jun 201162.2AppointedBishop of Hiroshima, Japan
23 Sep 201162.5Ordained BishopBishop of Hiroshima, Japan
20 Aug 201465.4AppointedArchbishop of Osaka, Japan
28 Jun 201869.3Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201869.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
16 Dec 201869.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

MicroData Summary for Thomas Aquino Manyo Maeda
Thomas Aquino Manyo Cardinal Maeda (born ) Archbishop of Osaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTsuwasaki, Kami Goto
Ordained BishopAssomption de Marie, Cathedral, Hiroshima, Diocese of Hiroshima

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Osaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2011
  • ob: CB, 25 Jun 2011
  • c2+: CB, 23 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,147
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Aug 2014
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018
  • i: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Dec 2018

Quantcast