Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Laurin Ricken

Bishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1952 BornDodge City, KS
12 Sep 198027.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
14 Dec 199947.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
6 Jan 200047.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
26 Sep 200148.9SucceededBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
9 Jul 200855.7AppointedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
28 Aug 200855.8InstalledBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for David Laurin Ricken:
Bishop David Laurin Ricken (born ) Bishop of Green Bay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Green Bay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,665

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 16 Jan 2014