Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Nicholas Tafoya

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pueblo, Colorado, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1933Born
12 May 196229.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
1 Jul 198047.3AppointedBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
10 Sep 198047.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
15 Oct 200976.6RetiredBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
24 Mar 201885.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Pueblo, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for Arthur Nicholas Tafoya
Bishop Arthur Nicholas Tafoya (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pueblo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlameda, Archdiocese of Santa Fe, New Mexico
Ordained PriestSt. Francis, Cathedral, Santa Fe, Archdiocese of Santa Fe, New Mexico
Death PlaceAlbuquerque, Archdiocese of Santa Fe, New Mexico
Buried Place (Original)Roselawn, Cemetery, Pueblo, Diocese of Pueblo, Colorado

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2009
  • d: CB, 24 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast