Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Vincent Casey

Deceased

Archbishop of Denver, Colorado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1914BornOsage, IA
8 Dec 193925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
5 Apr 195742.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
5 Apr 195742.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Citium
24 Apr 195742.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citium
14 Jun 195742.7AppointedBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
18 Feb 196752.4AppointedArchbishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
14 Mar 198671.5DiedArchbishop of Denver, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for James Vincent Casey:
Archbishop James Vincent Casey (born , died ) Archbishop of Denver

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013