Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Loras Joseph Watters

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Winona, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1915BornDubuque, IA
7 Jun 194125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
21 Jun 196549.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
21 Jun 196549.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Fidoloma
26 Aug 196549.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fidoloma
8 Jan 196953.2AppointedBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
13 Mar 196953.4InstalledBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
14 Oct 198671.0RetiredBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
30 Mar 200993.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Winona, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Loras Joseph Watters:
Bishop Loras Joseph Watters (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Winona

  • a priest for 67.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 18 Sep 2013