Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph Walker Nickless

Bishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1947 Born
4 Aug 197326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Denver, Colorado, USA
10 Nov 200558.4AppointedBishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
20 Jan 200658.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Ralph Walker Nickless (VIAF: 220582048)
Bishop Ralph Walker Nickless (born ) Bishop of Sioux City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDenver, CO
Ordained BishopNativity of Our Lord Jesus Christ, Church, Sioux City, Diocese of Sioux City, Iowa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sioux City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,041

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast