Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Samuel Joseph Aquila

Archbishop of Denver, Colorado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1950 BornBurbank, CA
5 Jun 197625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Denver, Colorado, USA
12 Jun 200150.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
24 Aug 200150.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
18 Mar 200251.5SucceededBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
29 May 201261.7AppointedArchbishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
18 Jul 201261.8InstalledArchbishop of Denver, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for Samuel Joseph Aquila:
Archbishop Samuel Joseph Aquila (born ) Archbishop of Denver

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Denver.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 May 2012
  • i: CB, 29 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,028

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 6 Feb 2014