Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Humberto Rodríguez-Novelo

Auxiliary Bishop of Denver, Colorado

Titular Bishop of Azura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1955 BornMérida, Yucatán, México
29 Apr 198227.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
29 Jun 198732.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
24 Dec 198732.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
17 Jun 200449.2IncardinatedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
19 Nov 200853.6IncardinatedPriest of Denver, Colorado, USA
25 Aug 201661.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
25 Aug 201661.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Azura
4 Nov 201661.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azura

MicroData Summary for Jorge Humberto Rodríguez-Novelo (VIAF: 171159789)
Bishop Jorge Humberto Rodríguez-Novelo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Denver

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Denver.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Aug 2016
  • ob: CB, 25 Aug 2016
  • c2+: CB, 1 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Nov 2016