Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edwin Vincent Byrne

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1891Born
22 May 191523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
23 Jun 192533.8AppointedBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
30 Nov 192534.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
8 Mar 192937.5AppointedBishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico
12 Jun 194351.8AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
25 Jul 196371.9DiedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for Edwin Vincent Byrne
Archbishop Edwin Vincent Byrne (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Fe

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained PriestSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Death PlaceSt. Vincent's, Hospital, Santa Fe, NM, Archdiocese of Santa Fe, New Mexico
Buried Place (Original)Saint Francis of Assisi, Cathedral Basilica, Santa Fe, NM, Archdiocese of Santa Fe, New Mexico

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 13 Oct 2019

Quantcast