Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Dennis Etienne

Archbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1959 Born
27 Jun 199233.0Ordained PriestPriest of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
19 Oct 200950.3AppointedBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
9 Dec 200950.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
4 Oct 201657.3AppointedArchbishop of Anchorage, Alaska, USA
9 Nov 201657.4InstalledArchbishop of Anchorage, Alaska, USA
29 Apr 201959.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
7 Jun 201959.9InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
3 Sep 201960.2SucceededArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Dennis Etienne
Archbishop Paul Dennis Etienne (born ) Archbishop of Seattle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTell City, IN, Archdiocese of Indianapolis, Indiana
Ordained BishopCivic Center, Cheyenne, Diocese of Cheyenne, Wyoming

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Seattle.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,323
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2016
  • i: CB, 4 Oct 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Apr 2019
  • i: CB, 29 Apr 2019
  • s: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Sep 2019

Quantcast