Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clement Mulenga, S.D.B.

Bishop of Kabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1965 BornDismashi
25 Aug 199631.0Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Aug 199833.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Oct 201146.2AppointedBishop of Kabwe, Zambia
17 Dec 201146.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kabwe, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Clement Mulenga:
Bishop Clement Mulenga S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Kabwe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kabwe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2011
  • ob: CB, 5 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013