Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolf Fürstenberg, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mbala, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1908Born
28 Mar 193627.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
11 Dec 195850.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Abercorn, Zambia
11 Dec 195850.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Termessus
25 Apr 195950.4AppointedBishop of Abercorn, Zambia
29 Jun 195950.6Ordained BishopBishop of Abercorn, Zambia
7 Mar 198778.3RetiredBishop of Mbala, Zambia
12 Nov 198879.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Mbala, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Adolf Fürstenberg
Bishop Adolf Fürstenberg M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mbala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIserlohn, Germany

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 62
  • dname: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 59, Page 1,128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 30 Jan 2018