Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Anwel Mtumbuka

Bishop of Karonga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1957 BornMajimbula Village
31 Jul 198830.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mzuzu, Malawi
21 Jul 201052.9AppointedBishop of Karonga, Malawi
20 Nov 201053.2Ordained BishopBishop of Karonga, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Martin Anwel Mtumbuka
Bishop Martin Anwel Mtumbuka (born ) Bishop of Karonga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Karonga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,864

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Aug 2016