Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tarcisius Gervazio Ziyaye

Archbishop of Lilongwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1949 BornKhombe
14 Aug 197728.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 199142.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dedza, Malawi
26 Nov 199142.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Macon
23 May 199243.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macon
4 May 199344.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
11 Nov 199445.5SucceededBishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
23 Jan 200151.7AppointedArchbishop of Blantyre, Malawi
3 Jul 201364.1AppointedArchbishop of Lilongwe, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Tarcisius Gervazio Ziyaye:
Archbishop Tarcisius Gervazio Ziyaye (born ) Archbishop of Lilongwe

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lilongwe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,776
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013