Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislaus Tobias Magombo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lilongwe

Titular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1968BornMatowe Village
3 Aug 199628.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dedza, Malawi
29 Apr 200941.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
29 Apr 200941.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
11 Jul 200941.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
6 Jul 201042.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lilongwe, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Stanislaus Tobias Magombo:
Bishop Stanislaus Tobias Magombo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lilongwe

  • a priest for 13.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,247
  • d: JPG
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013