Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Martin Musikuwa

Bishop of Chikwawa, Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1952 Born
12 Jul 198230.2Ordained PriestPriest of Blantyre, Malawi
16 Apr 200351.0AppointedBishop of Chikwawa, Malawi
28 Jun 200351.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chikwawa, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Peter Martin Musikuwa
Bishop Peter Martin Musikuwa (born ) Bishop of Chikwawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalimtulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chikwawa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,416

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018