Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Orlando Antonini

Apostolic Nuncio to Serbia

Titular Archbishop of Formiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1944 BornVilla Sant'Angelo, Italy
29 Jun 196823.7Ordained PriestPriest of L’Aquila, Italy
24 Jul 199954.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Formiae
24 Jul 199954.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Zambia
24 Jul 199954.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malawi
11 Sep 199954.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Formiae
16 Nov 200561.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
8 Aug 200964.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Serbia

MicroData Summary for Orlando Antonini:
Archbishop Orlando Antonini (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Serbia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Serbia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2005
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,606

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013