Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Nervi, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mangochi, Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1938Born
25 Feb 196123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
20 Nov 200466.8AppointedBishop of Mangochi, Malawi
29 Jan 200567.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mangochi, Malawi
8 Mar 200567.1DiedBishop of Mangochi, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Luciano Nervi
Bishop Luciano Nervi S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Mangochi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSforzatica di Dalmine, Italy

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,813
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast