Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Assolari, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mangochi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1928BornScanzorosciate
13 Mar 195425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
3 Oct 196941.1AppointedPrefect of Fort Johnston, Malawi
17 Sep 197345.0AppointedBishop of Mangochi, Malawi
8 Dec 197345.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mangochi, Malawi
20 Nov 200476.2RetiredBishop of Mangochi, Malawi
13 Apr 200576.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Mangochi, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Assolari:
Bishop Alessandro Assolari S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mangochi

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015