Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Cosmas Kanyama

Deceased

Bishop of Dedza, Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1962Born
4 Aug 199027.6Ordained PriestPriest of Dedza, Malawi
4 Jul 200744.5AppointedBishop of Dedza, Malawi
6 Oct 200744.7Ordained BishopBishop of Dedza, Malawi
17 Feb 201855.1DiedBishop of Dedza, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Cosmas Kanyama
Bishop Emmanuel Cosmas Kanyama (born , died ) Bishop of Dedza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDedza, Diocese of Dedza
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bembeke, Diocese of Dedza
Death PlaceKapiri, Diocese of Dedza
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Cemetery, Bembeke, Diocese of Dedza

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,547
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 18 Feb 2018
  • mn: CB, 26 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast