Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Desmond Tambala, O.C.D.

Archbishop of Lilongwe, Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1968 Born
1991²22.1ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
15 Aug 199526.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
13 Apr 199627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
15 Oct 201546.9AppointedBishop of Zomba, Malawi
30 Jan 201647.2Ordained BishopBishop of Zomba, Malawi
15 Oct 202152.9AppointedArchbishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
27 Nov 202153.0InstalledArchbishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
29 Nov 202153.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zomba, Malawi
12 Aug 202354.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Zomba, Malawi

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Desmond Tambala
(WikiData: Q22338197)
Archbishop George Desmond Tambala O.C.D. (born ) Archbishop of Lilongwe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZomba, Diocese of Zomba
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Zomba Catholic Secondary School, Zomba, Diocese of Zomba

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lilongwe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2015
  • ob: CB, 13 Nov 2015
  • c2+: CB, 31 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,803
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2021
  • i: AM, 7 Nov 2021
  • aadm: CB, 5 Jun 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 20 Jan 2024