Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vincent Frederick Mwakhwawa

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lilongwe, Malawi

Titular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1975 Born
12 Jul 200327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lilongwe, Malawi
15 Nov 202347.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
15 Nov 202347.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae
20 Jan 202448.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae

MicroData Summary for Vincent Frederick Mwakhwawa
Father Vincent Frederick Mwakhwawa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lilongwe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalima, Diocese of Lilongwe
Ordained BishopCivo, Stadium, Lilongwe, Archdiocese of Lilongwe

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Lilongwe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2023
  • ob: CB, 20 Nov 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 23 Nov 2023