Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodewijk Antoon Jansen, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1919Born
19 Mar 194525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
10 Jan 195232.1AppointedPrefect of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Jul 196242.6AppointedBishop of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Sep 196242.8Ordained BishopBishop of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
20 Apr 198868.4DiedBishop of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Lodewijk Antoon Jansen
Bishop Lodewijk Antoon Jansen S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Isangi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoenhout, Belgium

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018