Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Meulenberg, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda}

Titular Bishop of Hólar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1872BornHillensberg
12 Jun 192350.6AppointedPrefect of Iceland {Islanda}
30 May 192956.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda}
30 May 192956.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lunda
28 Jun 192956.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hólar
25 Jul 192956.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hólar
3 Aug 194168.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda}

MicroData Summary for Martin Meulenberg:
Bishop Martin Meulenberg S.M.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda}

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013