Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Evangelist Erich Müller

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Stockholm

Titular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1877BornGründholm, Germany
29 Jun 190325.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Oct 192244.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sweden
10 Oct 192244.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lorea
7 Jan 192345.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lorea
29 Jun 195375.6AppointedBishop of Stockholm, Sweden
1 Aug 195779.7RetiredBishop of Stockholm, Sweden
1 Aug 195779.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
5 Apr 196587.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Stockholm, Sweden

MicroData Summary for Johann Evangelist Erich Müller:
Archbishop Johann Evangelist Erich Müller (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Stockholm

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013