Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alois Hartl (Harthl)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Germaniciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1845Born
29 Jun 187226.8Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
13 Jun 192175.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
13 Jun 192175.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
4 Sep 192176.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
22 Jul 192377.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Alois Hartl (Harthl) (VIAF: 75050015)
Bishop Alois Hartl (Harthl) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNassenhausen

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast