Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Reth

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Lete


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1849BornFüssen
26 Jul 187323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
27 Apr 191666.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
27 Apr 191666.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
11 Jun 191666.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
2 Mar 193383.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Reth:
Bishop Karl Reth (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013