Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Kumpfmüller

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1869Born
28 Oct 189425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
17 Sep 193061.3AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
28 Oct 193061.4Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
10 Feb 194979.7DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Kumpfmüller
Bishop Josef Kumpfmüller (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchwarzenberg

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018