Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Buchberger

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1874BornJetzendorf
29 Jun 190026.1Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
13 Nov 192349.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
13 Nov 192349.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Athribis
20 Jan 192449.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athribis
19 Dec 192753.5AppointedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
12 Mar 192853.8InstalledBishop of Regensburg, Germany
29 Jun 195076.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Regensburg, Germany
10 Jun 196187.0DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Michael Buchberger:
Archbishop Michael Buchberger (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013