Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Franz Cardinal von Bettinger

Deceased

Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1850BornLandstuhl
17 Aug 187322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
23 May 190958.7SelectedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
26 Jun 190958.8ConfirmedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
15 Aug 190958.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
25 May 191463.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 May 191463.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
12 Apr 191766.6DiedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz von Bettinger:
Cardinal Franz von Bettinger (born , died ) Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
  • a cardinal for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013