Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigismund Felix von Ow-Felldorf

Deceased

Bishop of Passau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1855BornBerchtesgaden
25 Jul 188428.8Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
11 Jan 190246.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
11 Jan 190246.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
24 Feb 190246.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
18 Oct 190651.0SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
6 Dec 190651.1ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
6 Mar 190751.4InstalledBishop of Passau, Germany
11 May 193680.6DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sigismund Felix von Ow-Felldorf:
Bishop Sigismund Felix von Ow-Felldorf (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013